THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER & ST PAUL, SALTWOOD

Charity Number: 1130728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PCC has the responsibilty of co-operating with the Rector, The Reverend Stephen McCaulay( Rector from the 2nd November 2016), in promoting in the whole mission of the Church, pastoral,evangelistic,social and ecumenical in the Parish. It also has the maintenance responsibilities for St Peter & St Paul Church in Saltwood, Pedlinge Chapel at Ease and The Lads' Club,Saltwood.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £172,677
Total expenditure: £188,844

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC OF SALTWOOD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexandra Harrington Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
John Christopher David Hall Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Elizabeth June Lewsey Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Lt Col John Michael Campbell Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Derek Edward Harris Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Mary Hunter Trustee 18 May 2021
THE HYTHE CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Carol Anne Carr Eastell Trustee 18 May 2021
FIGHT AGAINST BLINDNESS - FAB
Received: On time
Rev Barry James Frederick Knott Trustee 02 July 2020
THE ROBERT THOMPSON CHARITIES AT SALTWOOD KENT
Received: On time
MRS TESS DURAN Trustee 22 April 2015
None on record
Robert Charles White Trustee 29 April 2014
WM SHEPPARD CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ST MARY 'S CHURCH , PORTSEA FABRIC TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH PORTSEA MUSIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev PATRICIA FRANCES HILL Trustee 13 July 2012
None on record
CHRISTINE PATRICIA DODD Trustee 21 April 2011
THE FOLKESTONE SCHOOL FOR GIRLS MUSIC TRUST INCORPORATING THE SMITH-PARKER TRUST
Received: On time
PENELOPE MARGARET MARSH Trustee
None on record
LAURENCE ROYDEN MAXFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £162.22k £190.53k £193.57k £167.59k £172.68k
Total expenditure £145.04k £122.48k £297.67k £138.58k £188.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £17.21k N/A £10.49k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 The Close
Saltwood
Hythe
CT21 4RA
Phone:
01303266095