BARKING DAGENHAM & ILFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting local Methodist churches in the London Boroughs of Barking and Dagenham, and Redbridge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

35 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barking And Dagenham
- Redbridge
Governance
- 26 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
35 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Saito | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Dawson MA | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joy Irene Browne | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Barry Leslie Vaughan ACIB | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Tom Shaw | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Dawn Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Arthur Jeremy | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SISTER V NICHOLLS | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MS S OCRAN | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOAN GLORIA MORRIS | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS V SLACK | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV B MANDLATE | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS T JUMBE | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MISS L BENTALL | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR C CLARKE | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS S BEST | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|||||
YINKA ODELOLA | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS G HOLROYDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS E WEATHERSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS B A WESTCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR P J BUTT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR C FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR S GRUNDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR D P GOMM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS S C RUCKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S L GRUNDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR B TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J A JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR C GALLEHAWK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR FUNMI AJOSE-COKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR R D NICKOLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR C G HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR K WILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR D CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J NICKOLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.41k | £283.15k | £314.73k | £294.42k | £293.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.30k | £332.43k | £309.21k | £291.91k | £313.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEACONTREE HEATH METHODIST CHURCH
THE BROADWAY
DAGENHAM
RM8 1DZ
- Phone:
- 02085176159
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window