WATH WITH BRAMPTON BIERLOW PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity carries out the work of the Parish Churchs of Wath upon Dearne and Brampton in the Diocese of Sheffield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rotherham
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- WATH ON DEARNE PCC (Working name)
- PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WATH UPON DEARNE (Previous name)
- PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WATH WITH BRAMPTON BIERLOW (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Campbell | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sunderland | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Bouch | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Matthewman | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Underwood | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bouch | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Vernon | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Henthorn | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Mary Frances House | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
BARBARA LORD | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Oliver | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY FELLOWS | Trustee |
|
||||||
GILLIAN FELLOWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.72k | £73.82k | £76.17k | £197.55k | £178.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.32k | £59.05k | £74.07k | £122.72k | £152.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Bank End Road
Worsbrough
Barnsley
Barnsley
S70 4QH
- Phone:
- 07983252600
- Email:
- j.oliver1523@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window