PENKETH METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public acts of worship to which all are welcome, whether or not Church members Smaller meetings (House Groups) enabling members and others to develop in their Christian faith Provision of support for specific groups within the church and local community Reaching out to the local community through (among others) the employment of a Children/Young Peoples worker and a Family worker
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warrington
Governance
- 19 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivien Palmer | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
DAVID MICHAEL FRANKLAND | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Margaret Frankland | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Andrew Coombe Moffoot | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Lesley Devers | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Agnes Docherty | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Mark Harwood | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Margaret Atkins | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Barbara Creamer | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Joseph Whittaker | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
KEITH WILLIAM GARDAM | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN RICHARD NEIL DEVERS | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
IAN LESLIE RAYNER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
BRIAN POWNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DORIS BESFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.18k | £56.82k | £78.53k | £78.46k | £79.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.62k | £81.32k | £92.95k | £68.93k | £84.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 FAIRFIELD ROAD
WIDNES
WA8 6SG
- Phone:
- 01514242494
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window