PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Paul's Church and Community Centre is a Church of England parish church just to the south of Cambridge city centre in the diocese of Ely. Its mission is to share the love of God in word and action. It provides space for people to pray and worship; to become part of a loving community through its outreach and community meals; and hires out its rooms to help support its mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £14,517 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST PAUL, CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Imogen Nay | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Rebecca Anne Applin Warner | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bone | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Chaplin | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jenny Mander | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Flynn | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucia Chaplin | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christopher Elliott | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SYLVIA DIAMOND | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Chaplin | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth von Rabenau | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Anne Robbins | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christina Tresilian Barry | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Caroline Wroe | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert McCorquodale | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.90k | £232.66k | £259.90k | £353.94k | £271.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £320.31k | £243.22k | £263.45k | £433.97k | £229.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | £15.37k | £23.73k | N/A | £14.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Pauls Church
Hills Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1JP
- Phone:
- 01223576899
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window