THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday and midweek services, Bible study groups, Sunday School, youth group, stay-and-play mums and toddlers group, Christianity Explored courses, apprentice training programme, prison ministry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,516,616
Donations and legacies | £3.46m | |
Charitable activities | £542.87k | |
Other trading activities | £127.67k | |
Investments | £73.00k | |
Other | £316.41k |
Total expenditure:
£4,475,950
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.48m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.48m | |
Retained for future use | £40.67k |
People

56 Employee(s)
42 Trustee(s)
315 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of London
Governance
- 04 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
42 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD W T TAYLOR | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Sarah Louise Tett | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Gabor Szarka | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Sarah Emily Strain | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Chun Yi Lee | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Theo Jones | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Kuiper | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Hannah Abraham-Araya | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Julian Charles Tristan Bertie | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Samuel Fox | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Harry Thomas Jackson | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Heather Margaret Wilson | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Yosuke Charles Wakiwaka | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Susannah Trafford | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Peter Bruce Anderson | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Anna Keziah Robson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Aggie Him Yau Yu | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachel Joy Steeden | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Philip Owen Hudson | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
The Rev'd Andrew Peter Balch | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||
JAMES DAVID ATHOLE LAING | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Maurice Bright | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Ranti Williams | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Glenn Sommerville | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Luke Cornelius | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Jeffrey Xiao | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Merley Okine | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Keep | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Mike Thorpe | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
LUKE WILLIAM SWATMAN | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
JAMES HOUGHTON | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
DR YIH-CHOUNG TEH | Trustee | 16 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
SARAH SAMANTHA TOO | Trustee | 16 June 2011 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD PETER TETT | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Dr ANEIRIN GLYN | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Congdon | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
SARAH ROSEMARY ANN FINCH | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JEREMY ANDERSON CBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
PAUL SIMPKIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Kyla Lynne Malcolm | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
ANDREW WALES KC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
ANDREW ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00m | £3.39m | £4.79m | £4.04m | £4.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.81m | £3.32m | £3.62m | £4.30m | £4.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.30k | £598 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.37m | £3.09m | £4.32m | £3.35m | £3.46m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £62.96k | £119.09k | £115.05k | £130.49k | £127.67k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £504.59k | £129.71k | £275.19k | £480.01k | £542.87k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £13.34k | £8.33k | £5.79k | £19.75k | £73.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £44.06k | £38.67k | £72.01k | £54.65k | £316.41k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £263 | £701.00k | £155 | £485 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.81m | £3.32m | £3.62m | £4.30m | £4.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.29k | £13.49k | £14.61k | £12.67k | £14.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £117.35k | £125.81k | £97.33k | £96.33k | £116.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £29.09k | £20.31k | £29.28k | £24.61k | £15.98k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.50m | £2.31m | £3.53m | £3.37m | £3.45m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £449.33k | £174.45k | £249.39k | £338.66k | £378.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. HELENS CHURCH
GREAT ST. HELENS
LONDON
EC3A 6AT
- Phone:
- 02072832231
- Email:
- reception@st-helens.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window