THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, LYONSDOWN

Charity number: 1131088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

- teaching existing members and seeking new followers of Christ - providing church groups for all ages with a membership that represents most local ethnic groupings - providing fully-accessible places of worship and meeting - providing devotional services - providing comfort and practical help to the bereaved and suffering - supporting missionary and outreach work - providing annual retreats

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £82,184
Total expenditure: £92,496

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HOLY TRINITY LYONSDOWN PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martine Whitaker Trustee 19 May 2024
CHIPPING BARNET FOODBANK
Received: On time
Leslie McCrory Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Paul Robinson-Beswick Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Christopher Willer Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Alison Slade Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Sonia Marianne Lucas Trustee 22 May 2022
NEW BARNET PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
Fiona Miriam Jones Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Rev Laura Jane Hewitt Trustee 03 October 2021
None on record
Rev Jennifer Fraser Robinson-Beswick Trustee 24 March 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES NEW BARNET
Received: On time
FOOTPRINTS FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN IN ZAMBIA
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £161.07k £110.89k £69.65k £81.28k £82.18k
Total expenditure £218.07k £151.44k £64.86k £55.93k £92.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Lyonsdown Road
New Barnet
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN5 1JE
Phone:
07530188773