Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST MATTHEW, CHELTENHAM

Charity Number: 1131805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £423.60k £515.20k £499.69k £552.29k £560.62k
Total expenditure £410.19k £459.33k £545.83k £541.79k £563.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £500.30k N/A £529.93k £529.53k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £811 N/A £15.23k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £3.91k N/A £4.12k £26.50k
Income - Endowments N/A £29.55k N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £8.32k N/A £2.69k £3.15k
Income - Other N/A £1.86k N/A £324 £1.44k
Income - Legacies N/A £56.00k N/A £24.32k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £459.33k N/A £540.96k £561.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £838 £1.97k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £2.20k £2.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £56.29k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0