THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK WORSLEY

Charity number: 1132732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides regular public worship and sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation open to all. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking religious assemblies in schools. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £232,071
Total expenditure: £277,511

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Salford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARK'S PCC WORSLEY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Adam Whittle Trustee 27 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY ROOD, SWINTON
Received: On time
Jade Phillips Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Paul Speakman Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
Peter Lumb Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
Paul William Heathcote Trustee 08 October 2020
Masonic Halls Trust
Received: On time
Elizabeth Ann Pollitt Trustee 08 January 2020
None on record
Carol Ann Sansome Trustee 27 April 2015
None on record
Lesley Hopwood-Ryan Trustee 28 April 2014
None on record
Greta Barwise Trustee 17 October 2013
None on record
Karen Owen Trustee 10 October 2013
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
KATH TONGE Trustee 26 July 2012
None on record
IRENE MARY BUTLER Trustee 26 July 2012
None on record
CHRISTINE ELLIS Trustee 26 July 2012
None on record
WINIFRED ANN MAYE Trustee 13 July 2011
None on record
FRANCESCA CHANTAL ORFORD Trustee 13 July 2011
None on record
JILLIAN MARY RAWSON Trustee 13 July 2011
None on record
HELEN VALERIE WILES Trustee
None on record
BARBARA LYON Trustee
None on record
SHEILA RADFORD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £200.45k £176.49k £147.53k £220.52k £232.07k
Total expenditure £199.38k £160.99k £173.51k £200.34k £277.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £23.24k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marks Church
Walkden Road
Worsley
MANCHESTER
M28 2WH
Phone:
01617905597