THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, CATFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lewisham
Governance
- 12 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 07 June 2017: Funds received from 303153 ST LAURENCE YOUTH CENTRE
- ST LAURENCE CATFORD PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corinne Browne-Marke | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Prince-Gilbert | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Harvey-Thompson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Dixon | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Thorne | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ihekuna | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Omondiale | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Williams | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marva Mayne | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Baker | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Chin | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Florence Browne-Marke | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGIT SAM-BAILEY | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victor Obasogie | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Turpin | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRACE BLYTH | Trustee | 25 April 1989 |
|
|||||
Canon CHARLES PICKSTONE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.46k | £253.96k | £294.79k | £318.13k | £357.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.15k | £256.49k | £291.43k | £331.94k | £342.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.26k | N/A | £20.00k | £50 | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 BROMLEY ROAD
LONDON
SE6 2TS
- Phone:
- 02086989706
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window