THE DEBENHAM PROJECT (DEMENTIA - CARING FOR THE CARERS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NO CHANGE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNDEN ASHBROOKE JACKSON BSC (HON) DMS PGCE FIEE FBCS [RTD] | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||
Carol Helen Garrett | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Tammy Belinda King | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM BLACKWELL | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||
MICHAEL PETER ROUSE | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||
ROGER COCKERTON FCA | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
Dr JOHN PATRICK SEYMOUR FIELDER MB,BS,BDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.38k | £9.21k | £8.84k | £14.49k | £8.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.94k | £3.93k | £14.30k | £14.46k | £11.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.28k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS, AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA, AS WELL AS THEIR CARERS AND FAMILY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, SERVICES, RESPITE AND GUIDANCE TO THE CARERS AND FAMILY OF SUCH PEOPLE. IT IS RECOGNISED THAT THIS OBJECT MAY BE FURTHERED BY EITHER GIVING SUPPORT OR SERVICES DIRECTLY TO THE CARERS, OR THOSE WITH DEMENTIA, OR JOINTLY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 HIGH STREET
DEBENHAM
STOWMARKET
IP14 6QL
- Phone:
- 01728860140
- Email:
- L.JACKSON225@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window