THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS WITH ST MARY MAGDALENE, CHISWICK

Charity number: 1132838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £190,483
Total expenditure: £144,580

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hammersmith And Fulham
  • Hounslow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST NICHOLAS PCC, CHISWICK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev SIMON FRANK BRANDES Chair
CHISWICK MONEY ADVICE CENTRE
Received: On time
Heather Johnson Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Alex Gewanter Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Richard Szwagrzak Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Michael Ian Dix Trustee 05 May 2023
None on record
Anu Tiina Elina Viljanen Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Rowena Ann Bentley Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
CATHERINE JANE TAYLOR Trustee 30 April 2023
AUDIOVISABILITY
Received: On time
Richard Louis Lea Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Rosemary Brown Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Richard Gwyn Jones Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Anne Mary McBride Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
ANTHONY DAVID SMITH Trustee 29 April 2018
1ST OSTERLEY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
THAMESIDE GRAND UNION DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Virginia Alexandra Featherstone-Witty Trustee 30 April 2016
None on record
Susan Welsh Trustee 08 May 2014
None on record
CHRISTOPHER LUCY Trustee 09 May 2013
THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS'S CHURCH, CHISWICK
Received: On time
ISLEWORTH & HOUNSLOW CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
NICHOLAS WILLIAM LINES Trustee
CHISWICK MONEY ADVICE CENTRE
Received: On time
CROSSLIGHT ADVICE
Received: On time
COMMUNITY OF ST ANDREW
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £183.62k £194.51k £284.62k £225.35k £190.48k
Total expenditure £169.77k £158.79k £273.09k £247.90k £144.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 November 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 November 2020 10 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE VICARAGE
CHISWICK MALL
LONDON
W4 2PJ
Phone:
02089954717