Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CRANLEY OTHERWISE CRANLEIGH
Charity number: 1131701

Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Roy Woodhams | Chair | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Tresman | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tuck | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hendy | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Watson | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Helen Shepherd | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward William Rothwell | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Lynn | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANN KNIGHT | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Bryn Jones | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Jenkins | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Walton | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Birgitta Clarke | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Bowles | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOAN CONNOLLY | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGIE NURSEY | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA KEEPING | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.