THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAULS, WESTON SUPER MARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Somerset
Governance
- 20 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST PAULS PCC WESTON SUPER MARE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Carol Howard | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mary Hayward | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Thomas | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel Robert Healey | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bray | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Janet Britton | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Tratt | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Blyth | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denys Rayner | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Cromwell | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Craig Philbrick | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon McKechnie | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Freddie Pimm | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fredrick Tamuton | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Williams | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Devereux | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £422.10k | £337.39k | £293.21k | £487.62k | £361.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £339.86k | £345.52k | £321.81k | £361.80k | £431.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.57k | £1.69k | £750 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PAULS CHURCH OFFICE
WALLISCOTE ROAD
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 1EF
- Phone:
- 01934756001
- Email:
- office@stpauls-weston.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window