THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, GOSFORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serving local community providing church services and wide ranging activities open to the community including regular playgroup in the church hall as well as hosting occasional concerts in the church and a multitude in between.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 12 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS' GOSFORTH PCC (Working name)
- PCC ALL SAINTS GOSFORTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV ANDREW SHIPTON | Chair | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Shoesmith | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dana Corso | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Mary Charlewood | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Gallacher | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
FRANCINE BAIN | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Hedley | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE JENNINGS | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marian Coulson-Cave | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Wilson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY JOAN OGILVIE | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANA LYNNE LAVIN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE DAVIES | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Place | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||
MR NICK GLOVER | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAM TAYLOR | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE KIRKUP | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.74k | £203.54k | £238.44k | £358.86k | £246.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.24k | £194.03k | £240.14k | £257.26k | £273.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.07k | £7.67k | £9.72k | £8.89k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
West Avenue
Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE3 4ES
- Phone:
- 01912130450
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window