THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP & ST JAMES, ODD DOWN, BATH & WELLS

Charity number: 1131533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parish Church. Weekly Services & worship. Families, youth & children's, older people's groups. Halls used by local groups. Drama. Monthly luncheon club for live alone. Mission work and support in our community and abroad. Link to local NHS St Martin's Hospital, local primary schools, food bank and private nursing homes for the elderly. Community mini-bus with support from local council (B&NES).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £244,825
Total expenditure: £219,735

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PHILIP & ST JAMES PCC, BATH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paul Ferguson Chair 23 September 2019
None on record
Rachel Jones Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Ian Bleakley Trustee 15 May 2024
KING EDWARD'S SCHOOL BATH
Received: On time
Matt Vaine Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Jae Munro Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Emma Louise Allen Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Joshua Saunders Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Chloe Robinson Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Dawn Benda Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Richard Corrie Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Helena Jane Midgley Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Paul Matthew Schaerer Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Gillian Purcell Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Victoria Mary Atkinson Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Caroline Riding Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Alison Joy Mottram Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
John Garrett Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
Graham Pearson Trustee
ODD DOWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £144.15k £253.04k £211.05k £207.24k £244.83k
Total expenditure £148.87k £238.31k £253.31k £200.98k £219.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.69k £4.69k £6.28k £6.55k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Philip & St. James Church
35 Frome Road
BATH
BA2 2QF
Phone:
01225835228