THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY HAREFIELD

Charity Number: 1131313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish of Harefield the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £187,773
Total expenditure: £157,129

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hillingdon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARY'S PCC, HAREFIELD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN DAVIES Chair 28 October 2011
HAREFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ST MARY'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RETREAT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE RETREAT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Victor Cuzmano Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Ann Badhams Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Kevin Hughes Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Susan Hewlett Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Beverley Louise Meier Trustee 16 May 2021
THE ST MARY'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Brenda Ives Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
ROWENA SANDRA ROBERTA SCOTT Trustee
THE ST MARY'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HAREFIELD DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES
Received: On time
MARK JOHN ROBERT DALTON Trustee
THE ST MARY'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Jill Dalton Trustee
THE ST MARY'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PINNER AND RUISLIP BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £156.95k £115.72k £168.34k £147.09k £187.77k
Total expenditure £177.69k £133.30k £145.22k £155.18k £157.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LONG LANE FARM
LONG LANE
ICKENHAM
UXBRIDGE
UB10 8QT
Phone:
07770868648