Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAGLEY ST JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH ST SAVIOUR
Charity number: 1132263

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Adrian Taylor | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas Robert Owen | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Elizabeth Piper | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Perkins | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fiona Taylor | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Francis Whitaker Norris | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margret Elizabeth Tindall | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Michael Smith | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Wendy Jones | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Robert Jones | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Lesley Mottershead | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bryant | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Moulder | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elaine Rankin | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Sophie Hindmarsh | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PENROSE GOWAR | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Albert | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN RACHEL PRIEST | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.