TAUNTON DEANE AND SOUTH SEDGEMOOR METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the circuit are set within the context of the Methodist Church Connexional policy of Our Calling.The church exists: to increase awareness of God's presence and to celebrate God's love; to to help people to grow and to learn as Christians through mutual support and care;to be a good neighbour to people in need and to challenge injustice;and to make more followers of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

32 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 04 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Annie Deche | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elaine Banks | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Jordon | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Mitchell | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Robin Hutt | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Hazel Jordon | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle Noble | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Merlyn Brown | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Rossiter | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
Carol Stowe | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Francis Lewis | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Peter Thomas | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER DOWNING | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Denise Jean Eggington | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
ROY CROUCH | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Sillett | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
KEVIN BOSELEY | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET WALTERS | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
REV TONY COX | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD SILLETT | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|||||||
Rev DEBORAH MARY KIRK | Trustee | 20 June 2011 |
|
|||||||
MR GRAHAM DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOANNE MARY PINGUENET | Trustee |
|
||||||||
LYNDA PRIMROSE SPURRETT KAZER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MS JANE ALLIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MERLYN RONALD BROWN CERT. ED. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
VALERIE ANNE PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ELAINE ANNE DEW M.ED. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARLENE ANN BURNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BARBARA EILEEN POOLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GLENYS HARRIET ELIZABETH ALLINSON BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID ALAN CLITHEROE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.16k | £152.76k | £139.25k | £135.24k | £138.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.24k | £152.25k | £138.67k | £144.48k | £160.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Craig Lea
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA2 7SY
- Phone:
- 01823344854
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window