CONWY AND PRESTATYN METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the Date of Union the advancement of: a) The Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and discipline of The Methodist Church; b) Any charity or society for the time being of any Connexional, District, Circuit, local or other organisation of The Methodist Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

38 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- COLWYN BAY & LLANDUDNO CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- COLWYN BAY & LLANDUDNO METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Adams | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Blair | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Thomas | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Rodgers | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Daniels | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Martin | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ted Francis | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Morgan | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev philip Berry | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Gleave | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Linda Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY JAMES | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Ray | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Gerrard | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Francine Moores | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vic Hitchings | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eleanor Reddington | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Smith | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET HUGHES | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Webb | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Jones | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARIS WILLIAMS | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BARRATT | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Chris Gray | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paula Hammond | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Janet Park | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev BARBARA BIRCUMSHAW | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAT PRESTON | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAGGIE COWARD | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROD BROCKLEHURST | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
NORMA BOOCOCK MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev MALCOLM DAVID WEATHERBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES MARY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN ANTHONY GERARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS LAWRENCE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SHORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.56k | £211.00k | £190.67k | £204.60k | £275.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £293.06k | £203.00k | £185.22k | £329.14k | £309.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John's Methodist Church
Mostyn St
Llandudno
Conwy
- Phone:
- 01492 860439
- Email:
- cpmcoffice2@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window