Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAWRENCE, NORTH WINGFIELD
Charity number: 1132017

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Clark | Chair | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Alexander Lee | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Green | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stanley | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Silk | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Thacker | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Hall | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Elton | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Valerie Ann Fenton | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
MELANIE JAYNE EARLAND | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Lisa Michelle Reeve | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Kinsell | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN COOPER | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Sandra Crawley | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.