THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINTHORPE, MIDDLESBROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Worship 2) Sunday School children's groups 3) Miscellaneous social activities 4) Outreach into the community 5) Christian teaching 6) Fundraising for overseas causes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Middlesbrough
- Ghana
- Peru
- Thailand
- Uganda
Governance
- 19 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 05 January 2024: Funds received from 286488 THE INGLEBY CHARITABLE TRUST
- LINTHORPE ST. BARNABAS PCC, MIDDLESBROUGH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dr David John Goodhew | Chair | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard James William Peacock | Trustee | 12 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Allan | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debra Ann Smith | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen McGregor | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Fay Burgess-Hale | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chinedu Michael Anioke | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Charles Peter Cawdell | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PAUL BURY | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Andrew Hutchings | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fiona Joy Houldsworth | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Bell | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Douglas McGregor | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gail Joan Roberts | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lindsey Jane Ellin Goodhew | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|||||
BARBARA RUTH EDWARDS | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALLISON WARD | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Bolton | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.33k | £241.91k | £291.93k | £330.15k | £375.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £308.75k | £264.50k | £308.87k | £357.86k | £389.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Barnabas Church
1A St. Barnabas Road
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS5 6JR
- Phone:
- 01642812622
- Email:
- office@st-barnabas.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window