Llantrisant Ministry Area - Known as Llan Ministry Area changed by decree 01/01/2022

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of regular public worship. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons and small groups. Taking of Assemblies in local schools. Promotion of Christianity through staging of events and services, and the distribution of literature. Provision of youth clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PARISH OF LLANTRISANT PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Vincent Gardner | Chair | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Belinda Huxtable-goy | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Glyn Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Burgess | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Thomas Allan Freeman | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Anne Brown | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Averill Mair Wintle | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Lloyd Jones | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Digby Nigel Davies-Thomas | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David James Allen | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geoffrey Ashton | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ELIZABETH WEST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.47k | £407.96k | £254.85k | £417.33k | £692.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.65k | £97.94k | £235.18k | £493.04k | £382.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £311.47k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.57k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £198.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £379.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £436.50k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £657.35k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.08m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 November 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 November 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 178 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920 as amended on 01 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Coed Yr Esgob
Llantrisant
PONTYCLUN
Mid Glamorgan
CF72 8EL
- Phone:
- 01443239058
- Email:
- shirleyevans@llan.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window