TAMID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Advance religious education by providing grants and assistance with basic living costs to people in need to allow them to undertake relevant academic study.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 08 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Binyamin Tatz | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yitsy David | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ILAN WEINSTEIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.12k | £58.11k | £37.38k | £26.12k | £20.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.06k | £56.02k | £47.44k | £30.22k | £12.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 AUGUST 2009 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 6 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
ALLEVIATING POVERTY ADVANCING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1ST FLOOR
Laser House
132-140 Goswell Road
LONDON
EC1V 7DY
- Phone:
- 01617981660
- Email:
- info@tamid.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window