WANTAGE AND GROVE STREET PASTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local Christian church communities cooperating to promote the protection, safety and education of all people particularly those congregating on the local streets/public places at night time; promoting relief of all sick people at risk by the offering of guidance, support, protection and, as appropriate, referral to specialist agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 February 2010: Standard registration
- 17 January 2022: Funds received from 1091995 WANTAGE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST
- W&G SPS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Peter Smith | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gander | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Philip Elliott | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Marjory Anne Lunn | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|||||
STEVE WEST | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.83k | £9.88k | £20.16k | £14.06k | £12.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.50k | £11.67k | £15.22k | £13.41k | £18.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | N/A | £5.50k | £6.50k | £4.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 February 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED 30 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE IN AND AROUND WANTAGE AND GROVE IN OXFORDSHIRE THE PROTECTION, SAFETY AND EDUCATION OF ALL PEOPLE, REGARDLESS OF THEIR GENDER, RACE, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, PHYSICAL OR OTHER DISABILITY; AND PARTICULARLY PEOPLE CONGREGATING ON THE STREETS AND IN PUBLIC PLACES AT NIGHT TIME. 2 TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL SICK PEOPLE AT RISK, BUT PARTICULARLY PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND IN PUBLIC PLACES IN THE SAID REGION WHO MAY BE IN PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS BY REASON OF INEBRIATION, SUBSTANCE MISUSE OR OTHERWISE, BY THE OFFERING OF GUIDANCE, SUPPORT, PROTECTION AND, AS APPROPRIATE , BY REFERRAL TO RELEVANTLY SKILLED SPECIALIST AGENCIES. 3 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ENABLING THE LOCAL CHURCH COMMUNITIES TO COOPERATE IN CARE, COMPASSION AND RELEVANT PRACTICAL AND SPIRITUAL HELP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FOR PEOPLE IN THE SITUATIONS DESCRIBED.
Area of benefit
WANTAGE AND GROVE IN OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Churchward Close
Grove
Wantage
OX12 0QZ
- Phone:
- 07970246024
- Website:
-
wantageandgrove.streetpastors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window