GRACE CHURCH STIRCHLEY COTTERIDGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith primarily but not exclusively within Birmingham and the surrounding neighbourhood; and other such charitable activities as shall, in the opinion of the Trustees, further the work of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 09 August 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 09 August 2016: Funds transferred to 1155358 GRACE CHURCH DELL ROAD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.49k | £98.93k | £90.51k | £150.59k | £180.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.39k | £104.54k | £91.96k | £103.35k | £196.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window