THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER HIGH HARROGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all; the provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; pastoral work and teaching of Chrisianity through sermons, courses and small groups; Promoting the mission of the church through provision of a variety of activities. Supporting other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER'S PCC, HARROGATE (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alan Garrow | Chair | 07 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Hilary Paxton | Trustee | 20 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
JUDITH SIMPSON | Trustee | 20 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
David Hipkin | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Beverley Cooper | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy Robinson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael John Davies | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Paul Harris | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Leigh Thompson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Anne Edwards | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathryn Blake | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Camm | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Catherine Ailsa Medforth | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Catharine Davies | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sian Lockwood | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Christopher Charles Clayton | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £424.87k | £243.06k | £372.19k | £417.18k | £479.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £372.84k | £309.06k | £326.04k | £389.70k | £429.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.97k | £42.48k | £2.00k | £950 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Church
Cambridge Road
Harrogate
HG1 1PB
- Phone:
- 01423568218
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window