Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER HIGH HARROGATE
Charity number: 1134494

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alan Garrow | Chair | 07 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Paul Harris | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Leigh Thompson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy Robinson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Beverley Cooper | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Camm | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Anne Edwards | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathryn Blake | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Catherine Ailsa Medforth | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Maureen Atkinson | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ruth Thompson-Vear | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Ian Birt | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Leanda Felicity Moss | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
John Longstaff | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Catharine Davies | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Hipkin | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Sian Lockwood | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Hannah Beck | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Christopher Charles Clayton | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.