THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCELSIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES STYVECHALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Responsible for promoting to the ecclesiastic parish the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. Also maintenance responsibilities for the church and its halls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 28 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES STYVECHALE PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Simon Ally | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Clare Dolphin | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joshua Benjamin Grimwood | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Mark Boxall | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Mark Mullett | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Capitani | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Bradshaw | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Nelmes | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josh Maynard | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Roger Brian Graham | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Butler | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Selina Cross | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.09k | £158.74k | £161.63k | £180.89k | £197.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.77k | £192.12k | £150.46k | £150.12k | £170.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St James Styvechale Church Office
Knoll Drive
Styvechale
Coventry
CV3 5BT
- Phone:
- 02476692299
- Email:
- OFFICE@STJAM.ES
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window