RIPON AND LOWER DALES CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian faith through worship, teaching and service. We have 21 church communities based around the area of Ripon, Boroughbridge, bedale and Masham in the county of North Yorkshire. As well as worship we offer pastoral care and service to our communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£638,520
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £193.96k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £22.54k | |
Other | £422.02k |
Total expenditure:
£511,212
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £272.38k | |
Other | £238.83k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £238.83k | |
Charitable expenditure | £272.38k | |
Retained for future use | £127.31k |
People

2 Employee(s)
40 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 27 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- RIPON METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
40 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gareth Baron | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wild | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Ashby | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|||||
AMANDA JANE MILNER | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrea Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Clowes | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Broadwith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Jean Stelling | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Arundell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Elvy | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Emms | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Cowie | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE DALTON | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
ANGELA ARCHBOLD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Staton | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Emms | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Greensit | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joan Fothergill | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jan Goodall | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Fothergill | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ruth Verity | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Abel | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ABEL | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Stansfield | Trustee | 07 July 2000 |
|
|
||||
LISTER BAYNES | Trustee | 01 January 1998 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE SPENSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN GEORGE JENNINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH CHRISTINE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY ABEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ENSOLL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE OLIVE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT ERIC GREENSIT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON FIONA HOLMES | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHLEEN LOWRIE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET MARGARET WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILKINSON DUCK | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEOFF LOBLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.36k | £234.03k | £792.47k | £252.35k | £638.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.89k | £304.98k | £507.06k | £316.82k | £511.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £226.48k | N/A | £193.96k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £14.39k | N/A | £22.54k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £551.60k | N/A | £422.02k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £264.86k | N/A | £272.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £258.04k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £6.82k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £242.19k | N/A | £238.83k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £1.13m | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £634.91k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £681.36k | N/A | £98.58k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 281 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED 18 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ripon & Lower Dales Circuit Office
Allhallowgate Methodist Church
Victoria Grove
RIPON
HG4 1LG
- Phone:
- 01765698363
- Email:
- rldcircuit@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window