THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PANCRAS, LONDON

Charity number: 1133802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Parish Church serving the ecclesiastical area of St Pancras in London

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £388,483
Total expenditure: £330,455

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PANCRAS PCC, EUSTON ROAD, LONDON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev LUCY CLARE WINKETT Chair 29 November 2023
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF ARCHBISHOP TENISON
Received: On time
ST JAMES'S PICCADILLY CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
PROJECT FOR SENIORS AND LIFELONG MINISTRY
Received: On time
SAINT PANCRAS THANET STREET TRUST
Received: On time
SAINT PANCRAS CHURCH CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE UNITED CHARITIES IN THE PARISH OF ST JAMES'S WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
Dorothea Joy Laurencia Tangang Kouaghu Trustee 13 October 2024
None on record
Rev Jonathan James Wilton Lee KC Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Hilary Kalmbach Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
Professor Dorothy Sherman Severin Trustee 23 May 2021
SAINT PANCRAS THANET STREET TRUST
Received: On time
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Agnes Ogunmuyiwa Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Duncan Michael Lamont Trustee 30 April 2016
SAINT PANCRAS THANET STREET TRUST
Received: On time
DOROTHEA JOY HACKMAN Trustee
PROJECT FOR SENIORS AND LIFELONG MINISTRY
Received: On time
SAINT PANCRAS THANET STREET TRUST
Received: On time
SAINT PANCRAS CHURCH CHARITIES
Received: On time
CAMDEN CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
EUSTON FOODBANK
Received: On time
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
ANNE GILLIAN ROUSE BSC Trustee
PROJECT FOR SENIORS AND LIFELONG MINISTRY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £329.62k £329.62k £272.40k £292.06k £388.48k
Total expenditure £348.25k £348.25k £285.00k £254.78k £330.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Pancras Parish Church
Euston Road
LONDON
NW1 2BA
Phone:
02073881461