THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY NORTHWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England parish at Northwood
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 21 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 12 February 2024: Funds received from 1120629 THE BEN HELVEDOR CHARITABLE TRUST
- HOLY TRINITY NORTHWOOD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANN LOUISE LYNES MA | Chair | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthony Colin Lewis Leach | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Paul Edlin | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Baptiste Uch | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Hazel Elizabeth Paterson | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Charles Gomersall | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Josephine Suzanne Davison | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Carol Anne Prior Went | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Louise Went | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Caroline Coates | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan George Hooper | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr John Spencer | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Janet Mary Ioannou | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Charlotte Spencer | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||
MR Carl Landsbert | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
SALLY ROGERS | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER DE HORSEY | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Carole Christine Hamwijk | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||
DR Toby John Trevor Partridge | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Newell | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||
NIGEL STANLEY WASHBOURN | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.63k | £204.92k | £259.15k | £180.43k | £206.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.63k | £211.85k | £260.60k | £165.19k | £212.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Ducks Hill Road
NORTHWOOD
Middlesex
HA6 2NW
- Phone:
- 01923450981
- Email:
- office@htnorthwood.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window