THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES' CHURCH POOLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. A sacred place for personal prayer and contemplation, pastoral work, visiting sick and bereaved, teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups, provision of children's group, promoting mission of Christianity through specific groups. Supporting mission work and charities overseeas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 25 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES' PCC POOLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Lucinda Jane HOLT | Chair | 14 December 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Fred Poate | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Teresa Woodall | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
James Wallace-Hadrill | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Robert Fleming | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Richard Ashwell | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Carole Goddard | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Agnes Medrycka | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Linda Nother | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jill Bailey | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Paul Luxton | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Caroline Oehring | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Nick Hodgson | Trustee | 26 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sue Mothersole | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.76k | £109.37k | £229.69k | £114.38k | £97.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.73k | £137.42k | £193.43k | £144.78k | £116.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.29k | £5.23k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St James Church
Thames Street
Poole
Dorset
BH15 1JN
- Phone:
- 012022677117
- Email:
- admin@stjamespoole.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window