Accounts and annual returns BORTH FAMILY CENTRE

Charity number: 1136393
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On Time