Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS PRESTON

Charity number: 1132970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £252.61k £260.81k £363.57k £781.35k £340.96k
Total expenditure £229.05k £250.14k £383.16k £392.87k £365.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £769.36k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £10.02k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.97k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £456.21k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £392.87k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.86k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A