THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WARMINSTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, open to all. Provision of quiet place for personal prayer. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Running a youth club with a Christian ethos. Running an alternative youth club. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH WARMINSTER PCC (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Anne CROSS | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ivor WATSON | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Louise WHITE | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Billinge | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Helen Louise WATSON | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Smith | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lorraine Sharon DOBBINS | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY KATHLEEN PREECE | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROY TROTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILTON ALAN HOLDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.89k | £146.00k | £157.44k | £167.34k | £149.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.88k | £142.07k | £163.92k | £221.70k | £154.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST CHURCH
WEYMOUTH STREET
WARMINSTER
BA12 9NS
- Phone:
- 01985212138
- Email:
- admin@ccww.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window