THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANN, MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the whole mission of the Church in the city centre of Manchester. To enable adults and children to come to faith and live a full life. To maintain and make available the parish church for the use of the community, in particular to allow a place of quiet and prayer, to maintain an historic place of worship, to support people in need and to promote appropriate music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 02 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 28 July 2020: Funds received from 526429 THE MANCHESTER, SAINT ANN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- ST ANN'S PCC, MANCHESTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Mark Lacy | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lacy | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Edwina Mary Johnston | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Cameron Hume | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gregson | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Moore Kyle | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Christopher Johnson | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stacy Angela Fox | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEN HALLIWELL | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER JANE FREW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.34k | £130.51k | £137.73k | £160.68k | £167.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.44k | £91.76k | £146.34k | £155.64k | £272.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.02k | £19.59k | N/A | £1.55k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ANNS CHURCH
ST. ANN STREET
MANCHESTER
M2 7LF
- Phone:
- 01618340239
- Email:
- manager@stannsmanchester.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window