Camara Education UK Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Camara uses technology to improve education and increase life opportunities for some of the poorest children in the world. We do this by setting up Digital Learning Centres (DLCs) in schools and training teachers how to effectively use those Centres to teach their students. We operate in Ethiopia, Kenya, Tanzania and Zambia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Ethiopia
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Tanzania
- Zambia
Governance
- 15 April 2010: Standard registration
- CAMARA LEARNING LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cormac Eugene Lynch | Chair | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Bolton Smith | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Elizabeth Wren | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rushi Millns | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frank Oliver Lehmann | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Basham | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|||||
ANDREW PETER SINGER | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JARVIS | Trustee | 01 November 2010 |
|
|||||
JOHN Dominic Weare BROWN | Trustee | 10 May 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £406.51k | £65.68k | £147.28k | £501.24k | £411.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £291.04k | £161.29k | £191.51k | £517.88k | £556.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £467.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £517.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 MARCH 2010 as amended on 03 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE IN LESS DEVELOPED AREAS OF THE WORLD THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (I) THE REFURBISHMENT AND DISTRIBUTION OF COMPUTERS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT TO THESE AREAS FOR THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND COMMUNITY PROGRAMS, (2) THE PROMOTION OF E LEARNING, THROUGH THE TRAINING OF TEACHERS AND OTHER ASSOCIATED STAFF IN THE USE OF INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES (ICT) TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATIONAL SYSTEM IN THESE COUNTRIES, AND (3) THE DEVELOPMENT OF DIGITAL EDUCATIONAL CONTENT FOR USE ON COMPUTERS
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
241A PORTOBELLO ROAD
LONDON
W11 1LT
- Phone:
- 020 8670 1225
- Email:
- ukcomputers@camara.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window