THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT GEORGE AND ALL SAINTS TUFNELL PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing:- Christian worship services Weddings, funerals, baptisms and other occasional offices Place for prayer and support for those suffering in body, mind or spirit Resources for spiritual and intellectual development. Supporting the local community through a range of activities. Allowing organisations to use church buildings to run activities that help build a healthier community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,240 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 08 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST GEORGE AND ALL SAINTS, TUFNELL PARK, PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Lilley | Chair | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Gemma West | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sophie Wastcoat | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Gerald Martin Wilson | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
James Anderson | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew Cooper | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Beatrice Monney | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tim McDowall | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Heather Hylton | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
Cllr Ruth Hayes | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
CATHERINE MCGOWAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.65k | £145.15k | £141.39k | £198.72k | £216.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.85k | £195.80k | £139.26k | £171.54k | £183.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.35k | £2.04k | £425 | £2.10k | £5.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GEORGES CHURCH
CRAYFORD ROAD
LONDON
N7 0ND
- Phone:
- 02076076678
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window