Financial history ST IVES FREE CHURCH (UNITED REFORMED) CHARITY

Charity Number: 1132694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £185.03k £134.96k £139.50k £197.03k £172.72k
Total expenditure £192.74k £155.63k £150.98k £177.53k £203.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £32.34k N/A N/A