Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHEADLE

Charity number: 1134783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £765.36k £582.28k £834.87k £767.25k £782.39k
Total expenditure £683.95k £646.27k £734.62k £984.68k £795.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £39.36k £28.94k £3.91k £363 £3.90k
Income - Donations and legacies £712.41k £525.02k £718.58k £623.47k £616.79k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £48.69k £53.58k £105.72k £122.24k £127.78k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.75k £3.48k £10.57k £21.54k £32.98k
Income - Other £1.51k £0 £0 £0 £4.84k
Income - Legacies £39.12k £1.00k £3.09k £500 £500
Expenditure - Charitable activities £682.18k £644.77k £732.31k £975.54k £792.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.77k £1.51k £2.31k £9.15k £3.29k
Expenditure - Governance £2.28k £2.35k £2.25k £2.39k £2.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0