Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHEADLE
Charity number: 1134783

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Jeanette Cookson | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Madeleine Faye Prescott | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Pugh | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Belinda Byers | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Marcus Killingbeck | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Gray | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev George Cowder | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Ian Chidlow | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Trish Wells | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Holmes | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Nigel Hooper | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Ian Howard | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Pugh | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Winsome Richbell-Brown | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|||||||||
JOANNE LOUISE DAVIDS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Stan Tomalin | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
DR Patricia Margaret Berry | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
RUTH HEATHER ORMISTON | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Navesey | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|||||||||
DAVID GRAHAM LOWCOCK | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
PHILIP GEORGE HENRY WELLS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
FIONA SUSAN GOODE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOHN LANCELOT BERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.