Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.PAUL'S, SCOTFORTH

Charity Number: 1134789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £133.42k £175.50k £126.21k £165.33k £261.86k
Total expenditure £128.26k £196.59k £128.49k £152.76k £214.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.85k N/A N/A N/A N/A