THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH BEDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Church of England Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH PCC, BEDFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Jonathan Thomas | Chair | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin John Williams | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Templeman | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Gwyneth Miriam James | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillipa Francis | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin George Rowan | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennie McAdam | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN JAMES DAY | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Gardner | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jean Cottenden | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jane Somervell | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Rees | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin William Hamilton | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Jane Marshall | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Robert Daniels | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Stevens | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ellen Day | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Baxter Russell | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Antony Brown | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARGARET BENNETT | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAY PATRICIA BERRINGTON | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FREDERICK BISHOP | Trustee | 09 March 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £455.94k | £346.10k | £314.62k | £354.37k | £387.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £351.29k | £304.70k | £313.12k | £326.08k | £362.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
The Office
140 Dudley Street
BEDFORD
MK40 3SX
- Phone:
- 01234327150
- Email:
- info@ccbedford.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window