Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ITCHEN VALLEY, WINCHESTER

Charity number: 1133110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eleanor Sara Janssen Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Jean Taylor Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Richard Theo Mezger Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Judith Bishop Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
Malcolm David Nicholson Hogg Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
John Barber Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
MARY CLARE HOGG Trustee 19 September 2023
THE JANE AUSTEN SOCIETY
Received: On time
David Anderson Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Rev Peter William Leyland Walker Trustee 11 September 2021
None on record
Sonia Jane Cragg Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Gerard Paul Bevis Stacey Trustee 23 April 2014
None on record