THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE'S SEVENOAKS WEALD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Co-operating with the Vicar for promoting in the Parish the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social & ecumenical. Maintenance responsibility for the Church building, the Church hall, the church grounds & burial grounds. Promoting the Christian faith through worship, teaching, pastoral care, service, discipleship & evangelism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST GEOGE'S PCC WEALD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV AMANDA HELEN CARR | Chair | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN MARTIN | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
NIKKY GOOZEE | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICK CARR | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL RICHARDSON | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
MATTHEW CARR | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev HANNAH REBECCA GLOVER | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Nicholas Broadbent Mr | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John Frederick Curtis | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Marian Charlotte Jones | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Paul Royston Goozee | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
lisa Martin | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Ann Miller | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Trevor Tommy Griffiths | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Johnson | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
ROSALIND ANN DURDANT-HOLLAMBY | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR JULIA DOROTHY DOWNING | Trustee | 25 April 2014 |
|
|||||||
JACQUELINE EVANS | Trustee | 28 April 2004 |
|
|
||||||
SHIRLEY ANN HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.38k | £99.38k | £94.94k | £90.14k | £101.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.96k | £118.96k | £94.19k | £73.24k | £79.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 DIMMOCK CLOSE
PADDOCK WOOD
TONBRIDGE
TN12 6HS
- Phone:
- 01892 834575
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window