NORTH SHIELDS & WHITLEY BAY METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our work is based around the four core areas of worship. learning and caring, service and evangelism. We provide a network of people who enable various experiences of worship. Personnel, technological and skill resources to equip churches and promote community development. Outreach events are also held to engage people with the central ingredients of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

30 Trustee(s)
89 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 04 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- NORTH SHIELDS & WHITLEY BAY CIRCUIT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV EVA WALKER | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Carol Baggaley | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Irene Carr | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Margaret Walker | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jean Maddison | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Bedigan | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Mason | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Cyril Bainbridge | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hutton | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Underhill | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin William Shaw | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Allan Graham Tipple | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Gordon | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Owen Lumsdon | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Enid Muriel Gordon | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Carol Davidson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Fenwick | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Hastie | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wylie | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev David WYND | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
BILL HASTIE | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRAHAM MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDRINA MARY DAVISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET GANNIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAN BOYLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARION TAWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Colin James Raistrick | Trustee |
|
||||||
Andrew Lowe | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET GIBSON STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £257.94k | £230.49k | £311.84k | £286.95k | £405.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.29k | £261.30k | £264.14k | £292.21k | £320.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 264 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Methodist Church
Ilfracombe Gardens
WHITLEY BAY
Tyne And Wear
NE26 3ND
- Phone:
- 01912512355
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window