THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST OLAVE WITH ST GILES, YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Olave's is an Anglican church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. OLAVE'S YORK (Working name)
- YORK ST OLAVE'S PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bill Read | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Clare Steele-King | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Wells | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nicole Dominique Marie Gladstone | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
Roger Button | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Reid | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Reverend Canon Elizabeth Claire Hassall | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Doreen Gurrey | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Lockley | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Frances Brock | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
BRENDA CHRISTINE STANTON | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Hopkin John STANTON | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
RUTH SILLAR | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Robb | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Ben Pugh | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET SUSAN EYRE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.71k | £111.87k | £102.57k | £219.19k | £359.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.01k | £91.06k | £112.89k | £250.76k | £133.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Parsonage House
29
Marygate
York
- Phone:
- 07871478891
- Email:
- secretarystolaves@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window