THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHURCH OF THE HOLY ROOD, EDWALTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all.The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation.Pastoral work,including visiting the sick and bereaved.Teaching of Christianity through sermons,courses, small groups.Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for parents toddlers and other special need groups.Promotion of Christianity.Supporting other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 30 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- EDWALTON PARISH CHURCH PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARK ADRIAN FRASER | Chair | 24 June 2014 |
|
|||||
ELAINE WILEY | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE JOYCE | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE SAYWELL | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BECK | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WILLIAM TREASE | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEFAN BECK | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM SAYWELL | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DAVID BATTE | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev ADRIAN DAVID PERHAM | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|||||
ROBERT ALLISTER CRADDOCK | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.27k | £58.03k | £104.60k | £93.74k | £85.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.33k | £82.28k | £107.67k | £129.53k | £100.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.99k | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Of The Holy Rood
Village Street
Edwalton
NOTTINGHAM
NG12 4AB
- Phone:
- 01159452019
- Email:
- edwaltonchurch@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window