THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER & ST PAUL, MOULTON

Charity Number: 1133729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Operates as the church council overseeing the activities of St Peter & St Paul, the parish church of Moulton, Northampton.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £287,291
Total expenditure: £285,316

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 2010: Standard registration
  • 08 May 2017: Funds received from 1075519 BARNABAS TRUST ROMANIA
  • 08 May 2017: Funds received from 1075519 BARNABAS TRUST ROMANIA
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST PETER & ST PAUL PCC, MOULTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Nicholas Edward Alexander Chair 22 March 2020
GRACE CHURCH UPTON
Received: On time
THE MOULTON AND OVERSTONE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Joanna Louise Wilson Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Neil White Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Lawrence James English Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Rev Philip Ronald Evans Trustee 05 August 2024
None on record
Roger Charles Smart Trustee 21 May 2023
NORTHAMPTON STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Martin John Wild Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Michael Bernard Fink Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Philip Michael Blackman Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Wendy Forsyth Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Peter Thomas Collins Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Peter Michael Storey Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Lynda Mary Featley Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Malcolm William Forsyth Trustee 30 April 2017
SCRIPTURE UNION
Received: On time
Dr Neal David Kennedy Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Jeffrey Trustee 21 April 2015
None on record
Rachel Cara Wild Trustee 28 November 2013
None on record
KATHY Mary MORRISON Trustee 28 October 2013
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN MONK Trustee 21 April 2013
BOYS BRIGADE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £248.78k £293.88k £258.10k £262.39k £287.29k
Total expenditure £273.57k £331.16k £257.54k £264.95k £285.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MOULTON PARISH CHURCH
CHURCH HILL
MOULTON
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 7SW
Phone:
01604495393